Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109070801B | Global Dossier | 21.12.2021 | B | CN109070801 | 21.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP55550 | 09.03.2017 | US201615134966 | 21.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3445610 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2020 | B1 | EP3445610 | 27.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP55550 | 09.03.2017 | US201615134966 | 21.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017182193 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615134966 | 21.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10011299 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2018 | B2 | US2017305462 | 26.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615134966 | 21.04.2016 |