EP3430775 - CONSTRUCTIBLE AUTOMATA FOR INTERNET ROUTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlamp, Johann Molkereiweg 1 86643 Rennertshofen / DE | [2024/25] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Schlamp, Johann Eisengasse 124 86633 Neuburg a.d. Donau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2024/28] |
Former [2019/04] | Kunz, Herbert Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17710239.9 | 10.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017EP55717 | Priority number, date | DE201610204475 | 17.03.2016 Original published format: DE102016204475 | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017157801 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3430775 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3430775 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/02, H04L45/00, H04L9/40 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H04L63/1466 (EP,US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04L63/1416 (EP,US);
H04L2463/146 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | H04L12/715 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONSTRUIERBARE AUTOMATEN FÜR INTERNETROUTEN | [2019/04] | English: | CONSTRUCTIBLE AUTOMATA FOR INTERNET ROUTES | [2019/04] | French: | AUTOMATES ASSEMBLABLES DESTINÉ AUX ROUTES INTERNET | [2024/25] |
Former [2019/04] | AUTOMATE ASSEMBLABLE DESTINÉ AUX ITINÉRAIRES INTERNET | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 20.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | US5414833 | US7802094 |