EP3419984 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A MIXTURE OF MONOSACCHARIDES AND/OR OLIGOSACCHARIDES AND/OR POLYSACCHARIDES BY PURIFICATION OF A HYDROLYSATE OF LIGNOCELLULOSIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/01] | METHOD FOR PREPARING A MONOSACCHARIDE AND/OR OLIGOSACCHARIDE AND/OR POLYSACCHARIDE MIXTURE BY PURIFYING A LIGNOCELLULOSIC MATERIAL HYDROLYSATE | ||
[2021/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Polytechnique de Grenoble 46 avenue Félix Viallet 38031 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIRAT, Christine 12 avenue Rochambeau 38100 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
LACHENAL, Dominique 1 Place de la Commune 38130 Echirolles / FR | 03 /
BOUCHER, Jérémy 1 ter rue du 83ème régiment d'infanterie 31800 Saint Gaudens / FR | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Bronchart, Quentin Hautier IP Le Pulsar - 6ème Etage 4, avenue Doyen Louis Weil 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Bronchart, Quentin Cabinet Hautier 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 17710358.7 | 24.02.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017FR50415 | Priority number, date | FR20160051569 | 25.02.2016 Original published format: FR 1651569 | [2019/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017144829 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3419984 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3419984 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07H1/08, C07H3/02, C07H3/06, C08B37/00, C08H8/00, C08L5/00, C08L5/14, C13K1/02 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
C07H1/08 (EP,US);
C07H3/02 (EP,US);
C07H3/06 (EP,US);
C08B37/0003 (US);
C08B37/0057 (EP,US);
C08H8/00 (EP,US);
C08L5/00 (EP,US);
C08L5/14 (EP,US);
C13K1/02 (EP,US);
C13K13/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/01] | C07H1/08, C07H3/02, C13K1/02, C08B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MISCHUNG AUS MONOSACCHARIDEN UND/ODER OLIGOSACCHARIDEN UND/ODER POLYSACCHARIDEN DURCH REINIGUNG EINES LIGNOCELLULOSEMATERIALIENHYDROLYSATS | [2021/27] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A MIXTURE OF MONOSACCHARIDES AND/OR OLIGOSACCHARIDES AND/OR POLYSACCHARIDES BY PURIFICATION OF A HYDROLYSATE OF LIGNOCELLULOSIC MATERIALS | [2021/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN MÉLANGE DE MONOSACCHARIDES ET/OU D'OLIGOSACCHARIDES ET/OU DE POLYSACCHARIDES PAR PURIFICATION D'UN HYDROLYSAT DE MATIÈRES LIGNOCELLULOSIQUES | [2019/01] |
Former [2019/01] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MONOSACCHARID- UND/ODER OLIGOSACCHARID- UND/ODER POLYSACCHARIDMISCHUNG DURCH REINIGUNG EINES LIGNOCELLULOSEHALTIGEN MATERIALHYDROLYSATS | ||
Former [2019/01] | METHOD FOR PREPARING A MONOSACCHARIDE AND/OR OLIGOSACCHARIDE AND/OR POLYSACCHARIDE MIXTURE BY PURIFYING A LIGNOCELLULOSIC MATERIAL HYDROLYSATE | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 09.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2017 | AL | 15.12.2021 | AT | 15.12.2021 | CY | 15.12.2021 | CZ | 15.12.2021 | DK | 15.12.2021 | EE | 15.12.2021 | ES | 15.12.2021 | HR | 15.12.2021 | IT | 15.12.2021 | LT | 15.12.2021 | LV | 15.12.2021 | MC | 15.12.2021 | MK | 15.12.2021 | PL | 15.12.2021 | RO | 15.12.2021 | RS | 15.12.2021 | SI | 15.12.2021 | SK | 15.12.2021 | SM | 15.12.2021 | IE | 24.02.2022 | LU | 24.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | BG | 15.03.2022 | NO | 15.03.2022 | GR | 16.03.2022 | IS | 15.04.2022 | PT | 18.04.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.02.2017 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.02.2017 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
IE | 24.02.2022 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
LU | 24.02.2022 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 15.12.2021 | |
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 15.12.2021 | |
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | HR | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | HR | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | HR | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | LT | 15.12.2021 | |
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 15.12.2021 | |
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 15.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0214598 (PUREVISION TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [X]WO2006032282 (CAMBI BIOETHANOL APS [DK], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, lines 6-31 *; | [A]WO2010130889 (IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US2012021467 (ZHANG HOURUI [CN], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 0006-0008 *; | [A]US2015184260 (RETSINA THEODORA [US], et al) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A] - Anuj K Chandel ET AL, "Detoxification of Lignocellulosic Hydrolysates for Improved Bioethanol Production", Biofuel Production - Recent Developments and Prospects, doi:10.5772/16454, ISBN 978-9-53-307478-8, (20110901), pages 225 - 246, URL: http://cdn.intechopen.com/pdfs-wm/20063.pdf, (20150826), XP055209568 [A] 1-13 * page 225 - page 226; figure 1 * * page 230; table 3 * * page 232, line 1 - page 233, line 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5772/16454 |