Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11135376 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2021 | B2 | US2019091413 | 28.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP56139 | 15.03.2017 | EP16305275 | 15.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3429665 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP56139 | 15.03.2017 | EP16305275 | 15.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017158033 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16305275 | 15.03.2016 |