EP3416604 - MATTRESS FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING BEDSORES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wackermann, Guy 7 rue de l'Altenberg 67700 Monswiller / FR | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Hege, Frédéric Hege Conseils 1 Place Gutenberg 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 17710596.2 | 17.02.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017FR50364 | Priority number, date | FR20160070053 | 19.02.2016 Original published format: FR 1670053 | [2018/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017140995 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3416604 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3416604 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/057, A61L15/40, A61L15/46, A61L15/60, // A47C31/00, A61G7/047 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
A61G7/05715 (EP,US);
A61L15/40 (EP,US);
A61L15/46 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,US);
A47C31/007 (US);
A61G7/047 (EP,US);
A61L15/16 (US);
A61L2300/10 (EP,US);
A61L2300/208 (EP,US);
A61L2300/214 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/52] | A61G7/057, A47C31/00, A61G7/047, A61F13/06, A61L15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATRATZE ZUR VERHINDERUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON DEKUBITUS | [2018/52] | English: | MATTRESS FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING BEDSORES | [2018/52] | French: | MATELAS POUR LA PREVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DES ESCARRES | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 13.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2017 | AL | 29.01.2020 | AT | 29.01.2020 | CY | 29.01.2020 | CZ | 29.01.2020 | DK | 29.01.2020 | EE | 29.01.2020 | ES | 29.01.2020 | FI | 29.01.2020 | HR | 29.01.2020 | IT | 29.01.2020 | LT | 29.01.2020 | LV | 29.01.2020 | MC | 29.01.2020 | MK | 29.01.2020 | MT | 29.01.2020 | NL | 29.01.2020 | PL | 29.01.2020 | RO | 29.01.2020 | RS | 29.01.2020 | SE | 29.01.2020 | SI | 29.01.2020 | SK | 29.01.2020 | SM | 29.01.2020 | TR | 29.01.2020 | IE | 17.02.2020 | LU | 17.02.2020 | BG | 29.04.2020 | NO | 29.04.2020 | GR | 30.04.2020 | IS | 29.05.2020 | PT | 21.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 17.02.2017 | |
AL | 29.01.2020 | ||
AT | 29.01.2020 | ||
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
TR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.02.2017 | |
AT | 29.01.2020 | ||
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
TR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.01.2020 | |
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
IE | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
LU | 17.02.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
NO | 29.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2713935 (WACKERMANN GUY [FR], et al) [AD] 1-14 * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 2, lines 6-15 * * page 3, lines 12-17 *; | [A]FR2738481 (MICHAU CHRISTIANE LOUISETTE [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 2 * * page 7, lines 30-37 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2012297545 (ESSERS HEINZ-WILLY [DE]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0022] , [0038]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2014082843 (PAPADAKOS GEORGE [CA]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2014161550 (NEURO VISION HOLDING APS [DK]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, lines 10-12, 21-25 * | by applicant | FR2713935 |