EP3429986 - METHOD OF PREPARING SUBSTITUTED BICYCLO[1.1.1]PENTANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/04] | METHOD OF PREPARING SUBSTITUTED BICYCLO[1 1 1]PENTANES | ||
[2021/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SpiroChem AG Mattenstrasse 24 4058 Basel / CH | [2022/01] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Spirochem AG Wolfgang-Pauli-Strasse 8093 Zurich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Yoshikazu Schaffhauserstrasse 25 Glattbrugg 8152 / CH | 02 /
JIMENEZ-TEJA, Daniel Unterwerkstrasse 7 8052 Zurich / CH | 03 /
SALOMÉ, Christophe 4 rue Gaesslegaertenweg 68420 Herrlisheim Près Colmar / FR | 04 /
FESSARD, Thomas Seestrasse 168 8700 Küsnacht / CH | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | Rentsch Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 203 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 17710733.1 | 14.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017EP55979 | Priority number, date | CH20160000330 | 14.03.2016 Original published format: CH 3302016 | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017157932 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429986 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3429986 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/343, C07C45/68, C07C69/753, C07C49/313, C07D263/16, C07C67/313, C07C235/82, C07C245/18, C07C231/02, C07C69/757, C07C13/605, C07C1/28 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
C07C67/343 (EP,US);
C07C1/28 (EP,US);
C07C227/18 (EP,US);
C07C231/02 (EP,US);
C07C231/12 (US);
C07C235/82 (EP,US);
C07C245/18 (EP,US);
C07C259/08 (EP,US);
C07C303/22 (US);
C07C303/30 (US);
C07C303/40 (US);
C07C313/02 (US);
C07C313/04 (US);
C07C313/06 (US);
C07C45/68 (EP,US);
C07C51/353 (US);
C07C67/31 (EP,US);
C07C67/313 (EP,US);
C07C67/317 (EP,US);
C07D263/16 (EP,US);
C07C2531/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/28, C07C13/605 (US,EP);
C07C227/18, C07C229/46 (US,EP);
C07C231/02, C07C233/58 (EP,US);
C07C45/68, C07C49/313 (US,EP);
C07C67/313, C07C69/753 (US,EP);
C07C67/317, C07C69/753 (EP,US);
C07C67/31, C07C69/757 (EP,US);
C07C67/343, C07C69/753 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2019/04] | C07C67/343, C07C45/68, C07C69/753, C07C49/313, C07D263/16, C07C67/32, C07C235/82, C07C245/18, C07C231/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUBSTITUIERTEN BICYCLO[1.1.1]PENTANEN | [2021/10] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING SUBSTITUTED BICYCLO[1.1.1]PENTANES | [2021/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE BICYCLO[1.1.1]PENTANES SUBSTITUÉS | [2019/04] |
Former [2019/04] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUBSTITUIERTEN BICYCLO[1 1 1]PENTANEN | ||
Former [2019/04] | METHOD OF PREPARING SUBSTITUTED BICYCLO[1 1 1]PENTANES | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 13.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2017 | AL | 05.01.2022 | AT | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | CZ | 05.01.2022 | DK | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | FI | 05.01.2022 | HR | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | NL | 05.01.2022 | PL | 05.01.2022 | RO | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SE | 05.01.2022 | SI | 05.01.2022 | SK | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | TR | 05.01.2022 | LU | 14.03.2022 | BG | 05.04.2022 | NO | 05.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | PT | 05.05.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 14.03.2017 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 14.03.2017 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.03.2017 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 05.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [IY] - PIOTR KASZYNSKI ET AL, "Toward a molecular-size tinkertoy construction set. Preparation of terminally functionalized [n]staffanes from [1.1.1]propellane", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19920101), vol. 114, no. 2, doi:10.1021/ja00028a029, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 601 - 620, XP055316484 [I] 1-17 * Schema III; Herstellung von [1]1f, [1]1j und 16; page 619, column l * * page 618, column l; compound [1]1y * * page 604, column l * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00028a029 | [YD] - PIOTR KASZYNSKI ET AL, "A practical photochemical synthesis of bicyclo[1.1.1]pentane-1,3-dicarboxylic acid", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, US, (19880901), vol. 53, no. 19, doi:10.1021/jo00254a038, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 4593 - 4594, XP055316492 [YD] 4 * page 4593 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00254a038 | [IY] - KENNETH B. WIBERG, "Small ring propellanes", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, US, (19890701), vol. 89, no. 5, doi:10.1021/cr00095a001, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 975 - 983, XP055316504 [I] 1-17 * page 977 - page 978 * [Y] 3,4,10-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr00095a001 | [Y] - ERNEST W. DELLA ET AL, "Synthesis of Some Bridgehead-Bridgehead-Disubstituted Bicyclo[1.1.1]pentanes", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19940601), vol. 59, no. 11, doi:10.1021/jo00090a015, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 2986 - 2996, XP055371495 [Y] 3,10-13 * scheme III; page 311; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00090a015 | [AD] - J. D. DANIEL REHM ET AL, "ChemInform Abstract: A Facile Route to Bridgehead Disubstituted Bicyclo[1.1.1]pentanes Involving Palladium-Catalyzed Cross-Coupling Reactions.", CHEMINFORM, DE, (19991221), vol. 30, no. 51, doi:10.1002/chin.199951083, ISSN 0931-7597, pages no - no, XP055316442 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chin.199951083 | Examination | - Luke D. Elliott ET AL, "Batch versus Flow Photochemistry: A Revealing Comparison of Yield and Productivity", Chemistry - A European Journal, (20141110), vol. 20, no. 46, doi:10.1002/chem.201404347, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 15226 - 15232, XP055316646 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.201404347 | by applicant | - M. R. BARBACHYN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1993), vol. 3, pages 671 - 676 | - A. F. STEPAN ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2012), vol. 55, pages 3414 - 3424 | - K. D. BUNKER ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2011), vol. 13, pages 4746 - 4748 | - Y. L. GOH ET AL., ORG. LETT, (2014), vol. 16, pages 1884 - 1887 | - APPLEQUIST ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1982), pages 4985 - 4995 | - ORG. SYNTH., (1998), vol. 75, page 98 | - ORG. SYNTH., (2000), vol. 77, page 249 | - P. KASZYNCKI; J. MICHL, J. ORG. CHEM., (1988), vol. 53, pages 4594 - 4596 |