EP3422898 - COSMETIC PRODUCT APPLICATOR COMPRISING SUPPORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chanel Parfums Beauté 135 Avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [2023/18] |
Former [2019/02] | For all designated states Chanel Parfums Beauté 135 Avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALCIARINI, Christian 4 Allée Hélios la Ritorte 83400 Hyeres / FR | 02 /
ARGIOLAS, Sophie 13 Rue Lemoine Rivière 95100 Argenteuil / FR | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/18] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2019/02] | LLR 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 17711718.1 | 01.03.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017FR50463 | Priority number, date | FR20160051769 | 02.03.2016 Original published format: FR 1651769 | [2019/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017149246 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3422898 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3422898 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/00, A46B9/02 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
A46B9/021 (EP,US);
A45D40/265 (KR);
A46B9/005 (EP,US);
A45D40/264 (US);
A45D40/267 (US);
B65D51/32 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETIKPRODUKTAPPLIKATOR MIT HALTERUNGEN | [2019/02] | English: | COSMETIC PRODUCT APPLICATOR COMPRISING SUPPORTS | [2019/02] | French: | APPLICATEUR DE PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE COMPRENANT DES SUPPORTS | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 01.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2012170965 (KULIK DANIELA [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,14,16,19,21,23-27 * paragraphs [0046] - [0054] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 2-4,6-13,15-18,20,22; | [XI]US2013276812 (KULIK DANIELA [DE], et al) [X] 1,24-27 * paragraph [0028] * [I] 2; | [A]US2014283868 (ZECH CHRISTINA [DE]) [A] 1,14,18* figures 38-40 *; | [A]US2016023388 (JACOB CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [A] 1,8,11-13 * figures 13a, 13b * | Examination | ITMI20082197 | WO2017003506 | WO2017115022 | by applicant | WO2008113939 |