Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109076407B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2022 | B | CN109076407 | 21.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615266733 | 15.09.2016 | WO2017US20970 | 06.03.2017 | US201662322096 | 13.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017249014B | Global Dossier | 02.12.2021 | B2 | AU2017249014 | 13.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615266733 | 15.09.2016 | WO2017US20970 | 06.03.2017 | US201662322096 | 13.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3443774 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2021 | B1 | EP3443774 | 20.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615266733 | 15.09.2016 | WO2017US20970 | 06.03.2017 | US201662322096 | 13.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018070986 | 29.01.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201615266733 | 15.09.2016 | WO2017US20970 | 06.03.2017 | US201662322096 | 13.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017180262 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615266733 | 15.09.2016 | US201662322096 | 13.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11089519 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2021 | B2 | US2017303169 | 19.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615266733 | 15.09.2016 | US201662322096 | 13.04.2016 |