EP3400269 - USE OF 4-BORA-3A,4A-DIAZA-S-INDACENES FOR SECURITY PURPOSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crime Science Technology 235 avenue de la Recherche 59120 Loos / FR | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRETE, Cosimo 4 allée du Trianon 59650 Villeneuve D'Ascq / FR | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Plasseraud IP 31, rue des Poissonceaux CS 40009 59044 Lille Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2018/46] | Cabinet Plasseraud 31, rue des Poissonceaux CS 40009 59044 Lille Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17712534.1 | 09.01.2017 | [2018/46] | WO2017FR50045 | Priority number, date | FR20160050164 | 08.01.2016 Original published format: FR 1650164 | [2018/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017118830 | Date: | 13.07.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3400269 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3400269 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, B42D25/387, C09K11/02 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B42D25/387 (EP,KR,US);
B42D25/47 (KR);
C08K5/0041 (KR);
C08K5/0091 (US);
C08K5/55 (KR,RU);
C08L23/12 (KR,RU);
C08L69/00 (KR,RU);
C09B57/00 (US);
C09K11/02 (EP,US);
G09F3/0291 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2211/1022 (US);
C09K2211/1055 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | C09K11/06, B42D25/36, G09F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON 4-BORA-3A, 4A-DIAZA-S-INDACENEN FÜR SICHERHEITSZWECKE | [2018/46] | English: | USE OF 4-BORA-3A,4A-DIAZA-S-INDACENES FOR SECURITY PURPOSES | [2018/46] | French: | UTILISATION DE 4-BORA-3A,4A-DIAZA-S-INDACÈNES POUR LA SÉCURISATION | [2018/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 26.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | DK | 21.04.2021 | |
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | DK | 21.04.2021 | |
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | DK | 21.04.2021 | |
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | HR | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 21.04.2021 | |
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 21.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5187288 (KANG HEE C [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * figure -; table 1; compound 40 *; | [A]WO9323492 (MOLECULAR PROBES INC [US]) [A] 1-24 * page 11; compound 2 ** claims 1,3,5 *; | [I]US2004000787 (VIG RAKESH [US], et al) [I] 1,7-10,15-23 * paragraphs [0002] , [0115] , [0118]; claim - *; | [A]US2011069307 (FORSHEE PHILIP B [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0003]; figures 1a, 6; claim - *; | [XAI]CA2921214 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,10,12-14,22-24 * paragraphs [0002] , [0032] , [0205]; claims 1,4,6,15,16 * [A] 2,11 [I] 7-9,15-21; | [A] - CHEN J ET AL, "4,4-DIFLUORO-4-BORA-3A,4A-DIAZA-S-INDACENE (BODIPY) DYES MODIFIED FOR EXTENDED CONJUGATION AND RESTRICTED BOND ROTATIONS", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY ETC.|, (20000418), vol. 65, doi:10.1021/JO991927O, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 2900 - 2906, XP000960871 [A] 1-24 * page 2900 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo991927o | [A] - TATSUYA AOTAKE ET AL, "An Optically and Thermally Switchable Electronic Structure Based on an Anthracene-BODIPY Conjugate", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL., WEINHEIM, DE, (20150323), vol. 21, no. 13, doi:10.1002/chem.201406384, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 4966 - 4974, XP055304412 [A] 1-24 * Introduction, Scheme 1;; figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.201406384 | [A] - HAI-TAO FENG ET AL, "Multicolor Emissions by the Synergism of Intra/Intermolecular Slipped [pi]-[pi] Stackings of Tetraphenylethylene-DiBODIPY Conjugate", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, US, (20151124), vol. 27, no. 22, doi:10.1021/acs.chemmater.5b03765, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 7812 - 7819, XP055304451 [A] 1-24 * Introduction;; compounds 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.chemmater.5b03765 | by applicant | EP0708935 | WO2010086522 | - A. TREIBS ET AL., JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM, (1968), vol. 718, page 208 | - CHEM. EUR. J., (2009), vol. 15, page 5823 | - J. PHYS. CHEM. C, (2009), vol. 113, page 11844 | - CHEM. EUR. J., (2011), vol. 17, page 3069 | - J. PHYS. CHEM. C, (2013), vol. 117, page 5373 | - D'A. LOUDET ET AL., CHEM. REV., (2007), vol. 107, pages 4891 - 4932 |