EP3413708 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RECORDING AND MONITORING HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENT IN LIVING FISH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/51] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECORDING AND MONITORING HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENT IN LIVING FISH | ||
[2021/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosort AS Burudveien 57 1350 Lommedalen / NO | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUGEN, Bernt Burudveien 57 1350 Lommedalen / NO | 02 /
IDSØ, Svein Tore Lillogata 10 0477 Oslo / NO | 03 /
HAUGE, Geir Stang Munkelia 8 1163 Oslo / NO | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2018/51] | Application number, filing date | 17713432.7 | 08.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017IB50672 | Priority number, date | NO20160000199 | 08.02.2016 Original published format: NO 20160199 | [2018/51] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017137896 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413708 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3413708 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01K61/95, A01K61/13 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
A01K61/95 (EP);
A01K61/00 (NO);
A01K61/13 (EP);
A01K61/60 (EP);
A01K63/00 (NO);
Y02A40/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG DER GESUNDHEIT UND ENTWICKLUNG BEI LEBENDEN FISCHEN | [2021/29] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RECORDING AND MONITORING HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENT IN LIVING FISH | [2021/29] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DE SUIVI DE LA SANTÉ ET DU DÉVELOPPEMENT CHEZ DES POISSONS VIVANTS | [2021/29] |
Former [2018/51] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG DER GESUNDHEIT UND ENTWICKLUNG BEI LEBENDEN FISCHEN | ||
Former [2018/51] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECORDING AND MONITORING HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENT IN LIVING FISH | ||
Former [2018/51] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DE SUIVI DE LA SANTÉ ET DU DÉVELOPPEMENT CHEZ DES POISSONS VIVANTS | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 07.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21202454.1 / EP3957171 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2017 | AL | 24.11.2021 | AT | 24.11.2021 | CY | 24.11.2021 | CZ | 24.11.2021 | EE | 24.11.2021 | ES | 24.11.2021 | FI | 24.11.2021 | HR | 24.11.2021 | IT | 24.11.2021 | LT | 24.11.2021 | LV | 24.11.2021 | MC | 24.11.2021 | MK | 24.11.2021 | NL | 24.11.2021 | RO | 24.11.2021 | RS | 24.11.2021 | SE | 24.11.2021 | SI | 24.11.2021 | SK | 24.11.2021 | SM | 24.11.2021 | TR | 24.11.2021 | LU | 08.02.2022 | BG | 24.02.2022 | NO | 24.02.2022 | GR | 25.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | PT | 24.03.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 08.02.2017 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
MK | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 08.02.2017 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.02.2017 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 24.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2011115496 (BECK ESBEN [NO]) [Y] 11,12,23,24 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 15 ** figures 1-2 *; | [XAI]WO2013108251 (CRYSTAL VISION AGRICULTURAL COOPERATIVE SOC LTD [IL]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10,15,20-22 * page 8, lines 12-25 * * page 9, line 27 - page 10, line 2 * * page 16, line 24 - page 17, line 10 * * page 18, lines 3-24 * * page 22, lines 8-20 * * figures 1, 2, 10-12 * [A] 11-13,16,17,23,24 [I] 3,6,7,14,18,19; | [XYI]US2014376783 (SKVORC II PAUL A [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,13,15-18 * paragraphs [0015] , [ 0016] , [ 0019] , [ 0037] , [ 0043] * * figures 1, 2, 8 * [Y] 11,12,23,24 [I] 3,7-10,14,19-22 | Examination | WO2011115496 | WO2013108251 | US2014376783 |