EP3429466 - MOBILE DEVICE FOR MEASURING ELECTRICAL BIOSIGNALS AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/04] | MOBILE DEVICE FOR MEASURING ELECTRICAL BIOSIGNALS | ||
[2021/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VitalSignum Oy c/o Health Innovation Village Kuortaneenkatu 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2022/07] |
Former [2019/45] | For all designated states VitalSignum Oy c/o Health Innovation Village Kuortaneenkatu 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy Vuorimiehentie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARPULA, Timo c/o Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy P.O. Box 1000 02044 Vtt / FI | 02 /
HELISTÖ, Panu c/o Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy P.O. Box 1000 02044 Vtt / FI | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Primrose Oy Unioninkatu 24 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2022/07] |
Former [2019/04] | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 17713992.0 | 14.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017FI50168 | Priority number, date | FI20160005214 | 15.03.2016 Original published format: FI 20165214 | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017158237 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429466 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3429466 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/30, A61B5/332, A61B5/024, A61B5/00 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A61B5/6831 (EP,US);
A61B5/0006 (EP,FI,US);
A61B5/332 (EP,US);
A61B5/0205 (US);
A61B5/02438 (EP,US);
A61B5/30 (EP,US);
A61B5/369 (US);
A61B5/389 (US);
A61B5/6804 (EP,US);
A61B5/6833 (EP,US);
A61B5/6898 (EP,US);
A61B5/7225 (EP,US);
H05K1/02 (FI);
A61B2560/0209 (US);
A61B2560/0214 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0443 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0462 (EP,US);
A61B2562/225 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/04] | A61B5/024, A61B5/04, A61B5/00, A61B5/0404, A61B5/0408 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILE VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG ELEKTRISCHER BIOSIGNALE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2021/46] | English: | MOBILE DEVICE FOR MEASURING ELECTRICAL BIOSIGNALS AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF | [2021/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF MOBILE DE MESURE DES BIOSIGNAUX ELECTRIQUES ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2021/46] |
Former [2019/04] | MOBILE VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG ELEKTRISCHER BIOSIGNALE | ||
Former [2019/04] | MOBILE DEVICE FOR MEASURING ELECTRICAL BIOSIGNALS | ||
Former [2019/04] | DISPOSITIF MOBILE DE MESURE DE BIOSIGNAUX ÉLECTRIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 25.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 14.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Request for further processing for: | 27.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request procedure closed | 06.09.2019 | Decision despatched | 27.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.09.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2017 | AL | 16.02.2022 | AT | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | CZ | 16.02.2022 | DK | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | ES | 16.02.2022 | FI | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | IT | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | NL | 16.02.2022 | PL | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SE | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SK | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | TR | 16.02.2022 | IE | 14.03.2022 | LU | 14.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | FR | 16.04.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | GB | 16.05.2022 | NO | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | IS | 17.06.2022 | DE | 01.10.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 14.03.2017 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
MK | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 16.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 14.03.2017 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 16.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.03.2017 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 16.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 16.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 16.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 16.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 16.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
DE | 01.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NO | 16.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004077954 (OAKLEY NIGEL R [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * figures 1-7, 10 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0 15] - [0016] - [0 32] - [0061] - [0 74] - [0083] * [I] 3,9; | [A]US2015364018 (MIROV RUSSELL NORMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 8-9 * * paragraphs [0061] - [0103] *; | [XI]US2015366506 (CHIEN JEN-CHIEN [TW], et al) [X] 1,4,7-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0023] - [0036] * [I] 2,3,5,6; | [XP]WO2016053731 (GOOGLE INC [US]) [XP] 1,10 * figure 6 ** paragraphs [0067] , [0 87] , [ 100] - [0101] * |