EP3423296 - ELEMENT FOR TYRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technium AS Rosenholmveien 25 1414 Trollåsen / NO | [2019/13] |
Former [2019/02] | For all designated states Technium AS c/o Innovasjonssenter Gløshaugen Richard Birkelandsvei 2 B 7491 Trondheim / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMUNDSEN, Paul Magne Gautesvei 12A N-1412 Sofiemyr / NO | 02 /
ANDENES, Sigmund Frederik Stangs gt.4B N-0272 Oslo / NO | [2020/13] |
Former [2019/02] | 01 /
AMUNDSEN, Paul Magne Gautesvei 12A N-1412 Sofiemyr / NO | ||
02 /
ANDENES, Sigmund St. Olavsgate 2 N-7012 Trondheim / NO | Representative(s) | Acapo AS Edvard Griegs vei 1 5059 Bergen / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Acapo AS P.O. Box 1880 Nordnes 5817 Bergen / NO | Application number, filing date | 17714032.4 | 27.02.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017NO50053 | Priority number, date | GB20160003502 | 29.02.2016 Original published format: GB 201603502 | NO20160000335 | 29.02.2016 Original published format: NO 20160335 | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017150983 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3423296 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3423296 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60C27/16, B60C27/06, B60C15/02 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
B60C27/063 (EP,KR,US);
B60C15/022 (EP,KR,US);
B60C15/0223 (EP,KR,US);
B60C15/06 (KR);
B60C27/062 (EP,KR,US);
B60C27/16 (EP,KR,US);
B60C2200/12 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEMENT FÜR REIFEN | [2019/02] | English: | ELEMENT FOR TYRE | [2019/02] | French: | ÉLÉMENT POUR PNEU | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 01.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | MK | 25.03.2020 | MT | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | SM | 25.03.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | NO | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | CY | 25.03.2020 | |
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MK | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | CY | 25.03.2020 | |
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | MC | 25.03.2020 | |
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | RO | 25.03.2020 | |
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | RO | 25.03.2020 | |
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | RO | 25.03.2020 | |
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 25.06.2020 | |
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | NO | 25.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US795906 (GARNER HENRY [GB]); | [XY]GB190929614 (BELL THOMAS LAWSON); | [A]GB510999 (JULES BERNARD VERCRUYSSE); | [A]US3260294 (ROSANA CAMPION); | [X]AT392761B (URLEB ALFRED ING [ST], et al); | [A]DE29719314U (BLUMBERG ROLF [DE]) |