|
15.02.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2020 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
07.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
18.07.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2019 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2018 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
06.06.2017 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |