EP3429929 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BANDING ROLLS WITH PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CMD Corporation 2901 East Pershing Street Appleton, WI 54911 / US | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELLE, Paul Paul A. Sellle 3516 N. Marcos Lane Appleton, WI 54911 / US | 02 /
WHITE, Christopher Christopher L. White 5889 Havenwood Hills Drive Little Suamico, WI 54141 / US | 03 /
PRELLWITZ, Gregory Gregory J. Prellwitz W4850 Country Gate Lane Black Creek, WI 54106 / US | 04 /
JANSEN, Thomas Thomas C. Jansen 1333 W. Roselawn Drive Appleton, WI 54914 / US | 05 /
JOHNSON, Gregory Gregory Johnson N1413 Westgreen Drive Greenville, WI 54942 / US | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Peter David Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 17714141.3 | 20.03.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017US23254 | Priority number, date | US201662310374P | 18.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662310374 P | US201662310340P | 18.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662310340 P | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017161380 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429929 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65B49/00, B65B51/02, B65B9/02, B65B11/06, B65H18/00 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
B65B9/02 (EP);
B31B70/942 (EP);
B31B70/946 (EP);
B65B11/06 (EP);
B65B49/00 (EP);
B65B51/02 (EP);
B65H18/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM UMHÜLLEN VON ROLLEN MIT PAPIER | [2019/04] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR BANDING ROLLS WITH PAPER | [2019/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR BANDER DES ROULEAUX AVEC DU PAPIER | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 02.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/39] | 19.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3659394 (HARTLEIB FRANZ, et al) [Y] 9-25 * the whole document * [A] 1-8; | [A]US3775939 (ELSNER B, et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US5299411 (YAMAMOTO KIYOHUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0785133 (ELSNER ENG WORKS INC [US]) [Y] 9-25 * the whole document *; | [YD]US2009019817 (SELLE PAUL A [US], et al) [YD] 9-25 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5377929 | US2009019817 | US7578779 | US8029428 |