EP3488425 - A PRECISION DISPENSER FOR LIQUIDS, COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR REMOTE CONTROL AND MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L. Molteni & C. Dei F.lli Alitti - Societa' di Esercizio S.p.A. SS 67 Tosco-Romagnola Località Granatieri 50018 Scandicci / IT | [2023/33] |
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states L. Molteni&C. Dei F.lli Alitti - Societa' di Esercizio S.p.A. SS 67 Tosco-Romagnola Località Granatieri 50018 Scandicci / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANGELI, Roberto Via dell'Acciaiolo 44 50018 Scandicci / IT | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Valenza, Silvia, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [2023/33] |
Former [2019/22] | Valenza, Silvia, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 17714155.3 | 03.03.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017EP54984 | Priority number, date | US201662365696P | 22.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662365696 P | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018015031 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3488425 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3488425 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/00, G07F13/00 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
G07F13/00 (EP,US);
A61J7/0076 (US);
G06F21/32 (US);
G06F21/34 (US);
G06K7/0004 (US);
G06K7/10297 (US);
G06K7/10425 (US);
G07F17/0092 (EP,US);
G16H20/13 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | G07F17/00, G07F13/00, G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Extension states | BA | 21.02.2019 | ME | 21.02.2019 | Validation states | MA | 21.02.2019 | MD | 21.02.2019 | Title | German: | PRÄZISIONSSPENDER FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR FERNSTEUERUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG | [2019/22] | English: | A PRECISION DISPENSER FOR LIQUIDS, COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR REMOTE CONTROL AND MONITORING | [2019/22] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE PRÉCISION POUR LIQUIDES, COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET DE SURVEILLANCE À DISTANCE | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 21.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.01.2022 | 20.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2022 | 07.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23186468.7 / EP4246477 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6206238 (OPHARDT HEINER [CA]) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [I]US2004210341 (WALLACE ROBERT L [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * paragraph [0142]; figures 2,3,4A,5A; claim 5 * * paragraph [0166] * * paragraph [0175] - paragraph [0178] * * paragraph [0314] * * paragraph [0322] * * paragraph [0416] *; | [I]WO2005043469 (MOLTENI & C [IT], et al) [I] 1-5 * page 2 - page 5; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [I]EP1702548 (GOTOHTI COM INC [CA]) [I] 1-5 * figures 1-4; claims 1-9 *; | [I]US2009219131 (BARNETT MICHAEL H [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0088]; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US2011017776 (METROPULOS WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]US2013317753 (KAMEN DEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0413] *; | [A]US2014121845 (MUELLER CARSTEN [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0035]; figure 4 * | by applicant | EP1165010 |