EP3436796 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PREPARING A SAMPLE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/06] | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEUTENBERG, Reinhard An der Alten Ziegelei 11 59423 Unna / DE | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 17714174.4 | 27.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017EP57175 | Priority number, date | DE201610205243 | 30.03.2016 Original published format: DE102016205243 | [2019/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017167681 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3436796 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3436796 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, B03C1/28, G01N33/20, G01N23/20 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
G01N1/286 (EP,CN,US);
B03C1/30 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2001/2866 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFBEREITUNG EINES PROBEMATERIALS | [2019/06] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PREPARING A SAMPLE MATERIAL | [2019/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE MATIÈRE À ANALYSER | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 30.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2017 | AL | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | EE | 11.03.2020 | ES | 11.03.2020 | FI | 11.03.2020 | HR | 11.03.2020 | IT | 11.03.2020 | LT | 11.03.2020 | LV | 11.03.2020 | MC | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | MT | 11.03.2020 | NL | 11.03.2020 | PL | 11.03.2020 | RO | 11.03.2020 | RS | 11.03.2020 | SE | 11.03.2020 | SI | 11.03.2020 | SK | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | TR | 11.03.2020 | IE | 27.03.2020 | LU | 27.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | NO | 11.06.2020 | GR | 12.06.2020 | IS | 11.07.2020 | PT | 05.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 27.03.2017 | |
AL | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.03.2017 | |
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | EE | 11.03.2020 | |
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | EE | 11.03.2020 | |
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | EE | 11.03.2020 | |
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | EE | 11.03.2020 | |
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 11.03.2020 | |
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
NO | 11.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3006472 (CLUTE FRANCIS H) [Y] 1,12 * column 1; figure 1 * [A] 6,15-17; | [A]US3279602 (KOTTENSTETTE JAMES P, et al) [A] 1,6,12,15-17 * column 2, lines 12-15; figures 1,2,7 *; | [A]US3318447 (ELLINGBOE JR JOHN L, et al) [A] 4,9* column 2, lines 43-44 *; | [Y]EP1052500 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,12 * paragraph [0002] *; | [XI] - Herzog Maschinenfabrik, "HP-MA / HP-PA Pulverizing Mill and Pellet Press in Modular Design", (20140707), URL: http://www.herzog-maschinenfabrik.de/fileadmin/content/downloads/en/productbrochure/HZ_PB_HP-MA_HP-PA_en.pdf, (20170614), XP055381616 [X] 1,2,6,11,12,15-17 * pages 2-4 * [I] 3-5,7-10,13,14,18,19 | [X] - Bruker, "Slag Analysis by X-ray Fluorescence Spectrometry", (20090918), URL: https://www.bruker.com/fileadmin/user_upload/8-PDF-Docs/X-rayDiffraction_ElementalAnalysis/XRF/Webinars/Webinar_200809_-_Slag_Analysis_by_XRF_Spectrometry.pdf, (20170614), XP055381474 [X] 1-3,5,11-13 * pages 38,39 * | [A] - Siebtechnik, "Automatic milling and pressing system AMP", (20130601), URL: http://www.christianberner.se/$-1/file/leverantorer/siebtechnik/dokument/automatic-milling-and-pressing-system-amp.pdf, (20170615), XP055382013 [A] 1,12 * page 2 * | Examination | US3274303 | by applicant | DE102013106998 |