EP3443691 - MODULAR SOFTWARE BASED VIDEO PRODUCTION SERVER, METHOD FOR OPERATING THE VIDEO PRODUCTION SERVER AND DISTRIBUTED VIDEO PRODUCTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVS Broadcast Equipment SA 13, Rue Bois St Jean 4102 Seraing / BE | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNICH, Olivier Boulevard d'Avroy 200 4000 Liège / BE | 02 /
BASTINGS, Michael Rue de Tilleur 275 4420 Saint Nicolas / BE | 03 /
VOUNCKX, Johan Tempelstraat 30 3210 Linden / BE | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Rossmanith, Manfred Bräutigamsweg 5 30974 Wennigsen / DE | [2019/08] | Application number, filing date | 17714245.2 | 03.04.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017EP57831 | Priority number, date | EP20160164809 | 12.04.2016 Original published format: EP 16164809 | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017178263 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3443691 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3443691 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/21, H04N21/23, H04N21/231, H04N21/234, H04N21/24, H04N21/235, H04N21/43, H04N21/8547, // G06F9/38, G11B27/034, G11B27/34, H04N5/222, H04N21/85 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
H04N21/231 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
H04N21/21 (EP,US);
H04N21/222 (US);
H04N21/23 (EP,US);
H04N21/234 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/2405 (EP,US);
H04N21/242 (US);
H04N21/43 (EP,US);
H04N21/8547 (EP,US);
G06F9/38 (US);
G11B27/3036 (US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N21/85 (EP,US);
H04N5/222 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | H04N5/222, G11B27/034, G11B27/10, H04N21/21, H04N21/2747, G06F9/38, H04N21/43, G11B27/30, // G11B27/34, H04N21/85 | ||
Former IPC [2019/37] | G11B27/034, G11B27/10, H04H60/07, H04N21/21, H04N21/2747, G06F9/46, H04N21/43, H04N5/222, H04N21/85, G11B27/30, // G11B27/34 | ||
Former IPC [2019/08] | H04H60/07, H04N21/21, H04N21/2747, G06F9/46, H04N21/43, G11B27/034, G11B27/00, G11B27/34, H04N5/222, H04N21/85 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARE SOFTWARE BASIEREND AUF EINEM VIDEOPRODUKTIONSSERVER, VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DES VIDEOPRODUKTIONSSERVERS UND VERTEILTES VIDEOPRODUKTIONSSYSTEM | [2019/08] | English: | MODULAR SOFTWARE BASED VIDEO PRODUCTION SERVER, METHOD FOR OPERATING THE VIDEO PRODUCTION SERVER AND DISTRIBUTED VIDEO PRODUCTION SYSTEM | [2019/08] | French: | SERVEUR DE PRODUCTION VIDÉO À BASE DE LOGICIEL MODULAIRE, PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER LE SERVEUR DE PRODUCTION VIDÉO ET SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION VIDÉO DISTRIBUÉ | [2019/37] |
Former [2019/08] | LOGICIEL MODULAIRE BASÉ SUR UN SERVEUR DE PRODUCTION VIDÉO, PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À FAIRE FONCTIONNER LE SERVEUR DE PRODUCTION VIDÉO ET SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION VIDÉO DISTRIBUÉ | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2017 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 27.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2017 | AL | 16.02.2022 | AT | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | CZ | 16.02.2022 | DK | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | FI | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | IT | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | PL | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SE | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SK | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | IE | 03.04.2022 | LU | 03.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | NO | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | IS | 17.06.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 03.04.2017 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 03.04.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.04.2017 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 03.04.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 03.04.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 03.04.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NO | 16.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002109710 (HOLTZ ALEX [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008022305 (ELGIA INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2009089128 (TKATCH ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [AD]US2009187826 (HEIMBOLD ANDREW D [US], et al); | [Y]US2010135334 (BRISCOE PAUL E [CA], et al); | [XY]US2010199322 (BENNETT JAMES D [CZ], et al); | [Y]EP2439650 (VERIZON BUSINESS GLOBAL LLC [US]); | [XY]US2013070047 (DIGIOVANNI JAY J [US], et al); | Examination | US2013272374 | by applicant | US2009187826 |