EP3433181 - PLASTIC LINER WITH INNER LINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mauser-Werke GmbH Schildgesstrasse 71-163 50321 Brühl / DE | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEYRAUCH, Detlev Im oberen Tal 12 52372 Kreuzau-Untermaubach / DE | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 17714393.0 | 23.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017EP00360 | Priority number, date | DE20161003496 | 24.03.2016 Original published format: DE102016003496 | [2019/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017162335 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3433181 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3433181 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/04, B65D77/06 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
B65D77/061 (EP,IL,KR,RU);
B65D77/0466 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
B65D11/10 (IL,US);
B65D11/20 (IL,US);
B65D25/42 (IL,US);
B65D77/06 (EP,IL,RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFF-INNENBEHÄLTER MIT INLINER | [2019/05] | English: | PLASTIC LINER WITH INNER LINING | [2019/05] | French: | CONTENANT INTERNE EN PLASTIQUE POURVU D'UNE POCHE | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 23.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | LU | 23.03.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/28] | CY | 08.01.2020 | |
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | EE | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | EE | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | LT | 08.01.2020 | |
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | LT | 08.01.2020 | |
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | LT | 08.01.2020 | |
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | LT | 08.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0415719 (BJK IND INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2090528 (PROTECHNA SA [CH]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO2011002925 (SCHOLLE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-13* figure 3 *; | [A]DE202014007695U (MAUSER WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,2 * |