EP3440711 - DETECTOR FOR AN OPTICAL DETECTION OF AT LEAST ONE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states trinamiX GmbH Industriestraße 35 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALOUCH, Sebastian Industriestraße 35 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
LUNGENSCHMIED, Christoph Industriestraße 35 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
HERMES, Wilfried Industriestraße 35 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
SEND, Robert Industriestraße 35 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
BRUDER, Ingmar Industriestraße 35 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/07] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 17714483.9 | 03.04.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017EP57825 | Priority number, date | EP20160164113 | 06.04.2016 Original published format: EP 16164113 | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017174491 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3440711 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/101, H01L31/0368, H01L31/0376, G01S7/481, H01L51/42 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
H01L31/1013 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/105 (KR);
G01S7/4816 (EP,US);
H01L27/14665 (EP,US);
H01L27/14669 (US);
H01L31/03685 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/03762 (EP,US);
H01L31/03765 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/03923 (KR);
H01L31/03925 (KR);
H01L31/1016 (EP,KR,US);
H10K30/40 (EP,KR,US);
H10K39/32 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2031/0344 (KR);
Y02E10/541 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTOR ZUR OPTISCHEN DETEKTION VON MINDESTENS EINEM OBJEKT | [2019/07] | English: | DETECTOR FOR AN OPTICAL DETECTION OF AT LEAST ONE OBJECT | [2019/07] | French: | DÉTECTEUR POUR UNE DÉTECTION OPTIQUE D'AU MOINS UN OBJET | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 06.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009013282 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | [A]US2012160298 (KANAMOTO KYOZO [JP], et al); | [IDY]WO2012110924 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | [XI]DE202012009070U (BALLUFF GMBH [DE]); | [D]WO2014097181 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | [YDA]US2014291480 (BRUDER INGMAR [DE], et al) | by applicant | US3112197 | EP0112169 | US4565761 | US4760151 | US4760004 | US4952472 | WO2011091967 | US2012206336 | WO2012110924 | WO2014086722 | WO2014097181 | US2014217329 | US2014291480 | EP2818493 | US2015111337 | US2015132887 | WO2016120392 |