EP3436807 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR INSPECTING BOARDS FOR MICROELECTRONICS OR OPTICS BY LASER DOPPLER EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unity Semiconductor 611, rue Aristide Bergès 38330 Montbonnot-Saint-Martin / FR | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GASTALDO, Philippe 412 Jardin de Bérénice 38530 Pontcharra / FR | 02 /
DURAND DE GEVIGNEY, Mayeul 5 avenue du Vercors 38240 Meylan / FR | 03 /
COMBIER, Tristan 61 Rue Saint Laurent 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2020/49] |
Former [2019/14] | 01 /
GASTALDO, Philippe 412 Jardin de Bérénice 38530 Pontcharra / FR | ||
02 /
DURAND DE GEVIGNEY, Mayeul 5 avenue du Vercors 38240 MEYLAN / FR | |||
03 /
COMBIER, Tristan 61 Rue Saint Laurent 38000 Grenoble / FR | |||
Former [2019/06] | 01 /
GASTALDO, Philippe 412 Jardin de Bérénice 38530 Pontcharra / FR | ||
02 /
DURAND DE GEVIGNEY, Mayeul 164 Rue Dacquin 73000 Chambéry / FR | |||
03 /
COMBIER, Tristan 61 Rue Saint Laurent 38000 Grenoble / FR | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/06] | IPAZ Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint-Aubin 91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17715055.4 | 14.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017EP55967 | Priority number, date | FR20160052835 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: FR 1652835 | [2019/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017167573 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3436807 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3436807 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/95 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
G01N21/9501 (EP,KR);
G01R31/308 (US);
G01N21/8806 (EP,KR);
G01R31/2831 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR INSPEKTION VON PLATTEN FÜR DIE MIKROELEKTRONIK ODER OPTIK DURCH LASER-DOPPLER-EFFEKT | [2019/06] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR INSPECTING BOARDS FOR MICROELECTRONICS OR OPTICS BY LASER DOPPLER EFFECT | [2019/06] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'INSPECTION PAR EFFET DOPPLER LASER DE PLAQUETTES POUR LA MICROELECTRONIQUE OU L'OPTIQUE | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 24.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2017 | AL | 02.12.2020 | AT | 02.12.2020 | CY | 02.12.2020 | CZ | 02.12.2020 | DK | 02.12.2020 | EE | 02.12.2020 | ES | 02.12.2020 | FI | 02.12.2020 | HR | 02.12.2020 | IT | 02.12.2020 | LT | 02.12.2020 | LV | 02.12.2020 | MC | 02.12.2020 | MK | 02.12.2020 | NL | 02.12.2020 | PL | 02.12.2020 | RO | 02.12.2020 | RS | 02.12.2020 | SE | 02.12.2020 | SI | 02.12.2020 | SK | 02.12.2020 | SM | 02.12.2020 | BG | 02.03.2021 | NO | 02.03.2021 | GR | 03.03.2021 | GB | 14.03.2021 | IE | 14.03.2021 | LU | 14.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | IS | 02.04.2021 | PT | 05.04.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 14.03.2017 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
GB | 14.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
GB | 14.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
GB | 14.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
GB | 14.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
GB | 14.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
GB | 14.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
LU | 14.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IE | 14.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 02.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5343290 (BATCHELDER JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [XI]US5710629 (KEVORKIAN ANTOINE [FR], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * column 2 * * column 3, lines 5-12 * [I] 2-8,10,11; | [A]US5883714 (JANN PETER C [US], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [XDI]WO0239099 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [XD] 1,9 * abstract * * page 3 - page 6 * [I] 2-8,10,11; | [XPI]WO2016050735 (ALTATECH SEMICONDUCTOR [FR]) [XP] 1,9 * abstract * * page 8, lines 30-31 * * page 12, lines 26-28 * [I] 2-8,10,11; | [XPI]WO2016050738 (ALTATECH SEMICONDUCTOR [FR]) [XP] 1,9 * abstract * * page 8, lines 30-31 * * page 15, lines 4-10 * [I] 2-8,10,11 | by applicant | WO0239099 | WO2009112704 |