blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3412095

EP3412095 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SENDING SCHEDULING REQUESTS WITH REDUCED LATENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.04.2025
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.10.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2025New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Motorola Mobility LLC
222 West Merchandise Mart Plaza, Suite 1800
Chicago, IL 60654 / US
[2018/50]
Inventor(s)01 / NORY, Ravikiran
1515 Johnson Drive Apt 923
Buffalo Grove Illinois 60089 / US
02 / NANGIA, Vijay
185 Aberdeen Drive
Algonquin Illinois 60102 / US
03 / BAGHERI, Hossein
1709 East Horizon Lane
Urbana Illinois 61802 / US
04 / KUCHIBHOTLA, Ravi
32 Tuttle Avenue
Clarendon Hills Illinois 60514 / US
 [2018/51]
Former [2018/50]01 / NORY, Ravikiran
1515 Johnson Drive Apt 923
Buffalo Grove Illinois 60089 / US
02 / NANGIA, Vijay
185 Aberdeen Drive
Algonquin Illinois 60102 / US
03 / BAGHERI, Hossein
1709 East Horizon Lane
Urbana Illinois 61802 / US
04 / KUCHIBHOTLA, Ravi
1093 Smithfield Court
Gurnee Illinois 60031 / US
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[2018/50]
Application number, filing date17715595.922.03.2017
[2018/50]
WO2017US23607
Priority number, dateUS201662317149P01.04.2016         Original published format: US 201662317149 P
US20161526235912.09.2016         Original published format: US201615262359
[2018/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017172447
Date:05.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3412095
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.10.2017
ClassificationIPC:H04W72/21, H04W74/0833, H04W52/34, H04L5/00, H04L5/14, H04L1/1829, H04L1/00, // H04W52/28, H04W52/36
[2025/17]
CPC:
H04L5/0007 (EP,CN,US); H04W72/21 (EP,CN,KR,US); H04L1/1854 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/00 (EP,US); H04L1/1861 (EP,CN,KR,US); H04L5/001 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0042 (EP,CN,US); H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,US); H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,US); H04L5/14 (EP,US); H04W52/146 (CN);
H04W52/281 (EP,CN,US); H04W52/346 (EP,CN,US); H04W52/365 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,CN,US); H04W72/1268 (US); H04W74/0833 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/50]H04W72/12, H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04W52/34, H04W52/28, H04W52/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN VON PLANUNGSANFORDERUNGEN MIT REDUZIERTER LATENZZEIT[2018/50]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SENDING SCHEDULING REQUESTS WITH REDUCED LATENCY[2018/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ENVOYER DES REQUÊTES DE PLANIFICATION AVEC UNE LATENCE RÉDUITE[2018/50]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2018National basic fee paid 
04.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2018Examination requested  [2018/50]
04.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2025Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2025Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
07.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 08
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO2015179136  (QUALCOMM INC [US]);
 [XIA]WO2016048593  (QUALCOMM INC [US]);
International search[XA]WO2015179136  (QUALCOMM INC [US]);
 [XAI]WO2016048593  (QUALCOMM INC [US]);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.