EP3439672 - STABILIZED SOLUBLE PRE-FUSION RSV F PROTEIN FOR USE IN THE PROPHYLAXIS OF RSV INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/07] | STABILIZED SOLUBLE PRE-FUSION RSV F PROTEINS | ||
[2020/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V. Archimedesweg 4 2333 CN Leiden / NL | [2020/48] |
Former [2019/07] | For all designated states Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V. Archimedesweg 4 2333 CN Leiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRARUP, Anders Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | 02 /
LANGEDIJK, Johannes, Petrus, Maria Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Manten, Annemieke, et al Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V. Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 17715692.4 | 04.04.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017EP57962 | Priority number, date | EP20160163810 | 05.04.2016 Original published format: EP 16163810 | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017174568 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439672 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3439672 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/12, C07K14/005, A61K39/12 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,CN,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/135 (IL,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,CN,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K35/12 (EA);
A61P31/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/1027 (IL,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,IL,US);
C12N5/0682 (CN);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/57 (CN,IL,US);
C07K2319/00 (CN);
C12N2510/00 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | 11.10.2018 | ME | 11.10.2018 | Validation states | MA | 11.10.2018 | MD | 11.10.2018 | Title | German: | STABILISIERTES LÖSLICHES PRÄFUSIONIERTES RSV-F-PROTEIN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER PROPHYLAXE EINER RSV INFEKTION | [2020/26] | English: | STABILIZED SOLUBLE PRE-FUSION RSV F PROTEIN FOR USE IN THE PROPHYLAXIS OF RSV INFECTION | [2020/26] | French: | PROTÉINE F DE PRÉ-FUSION DU VRS SOLUBLE ET STABILISÉE POUR SON UTILISATION DANS LA PROPHYLAXIE D'UNE INFECTION VRS | [2020/26] |
Former [2019/07] | STABILISIERTE LÖSLICHE PRÄFUSIONIERTE RSV-F-PROTEINE | ||
Former [2019/07] | STABILIZED SOLUBLE PRE-FUSION RSV F PROTEINS | ||
Former [2019/07] | PROTÉINES F DU VRS DE PRÉ-FUSION SOLUBLES STABILISÉES | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 11.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 05.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20201970.9 / EP3808374 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Request for further processing for: | 05.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.09.2019 | Decision despatched | 05.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.09.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2022/07] |
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]WO2014174018 (CRUCELL HOLLAND BV [NL]) [XD] 1-4,7-9,11 * SeqIdNo.74 *; page 51, line 11; tables 8-12 * * figures 8,9; example 12; table 9 *[I] 1-11; | [X] - "RSV fusion protein N67I S215P, RSV CL57-v224, fibritin, SEQ: 74.", Geneseq, (20141218), Database accession no. BBP75438, URL: EBI, XP002761983 [X] 1-4,7-9,11 * sequence . * |