27.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
03.06.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
30.07.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
25.06.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
22.06.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.06.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.06.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
10.12.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.09.2020 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
31.08.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.08.2020 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
28.08.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
24.06.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.10.2019 |
First examination report |
|
11.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.05.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
10.05.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
16.04.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
14.12.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.12.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
19.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.09.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
18.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|