29.03.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
28.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.12.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.11.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
24.11.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
27.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.06.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.03.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.03.2022 |
First examination report |
|
03.09.2021 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2020 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
10.05.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
10.05.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
16.04.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
14.12.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.12.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
19.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
19.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|