Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3430298 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2020 | B1 | EP3430298 | 23.01.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | NL2016455 | 18.03.2016 | WO2017NL50173 | 20.03.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017160153 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2017 | A3 | WO2017160153 | 21.09.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | NL2016455 | 18.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL2016455B | 03.10.2017 | B1 | Priority number | Date | NL2016455 | 18.03.2016 |