EP3432877 - D-ALPHA-METHYLDOPA FOR TREATING AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/05] | METHODS OF TREATING AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE | ||
[2022/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ImmunoMolecular Therapeutics, Inc. 299 Washington Street, Suite A Woburn, MA 01801 / US | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado, a body corporate 1800 Grant Street, 8th Floor Denver, CO 80203 / US | [2023/02] |
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states ImmunoMolecular Therapeutics, Inc. 3513 S. Brighton Blvd., Suite 431 Denver, CO 80216 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado, a body corporate 1800 Grant Street, 8th Floor Denver, CO 80203 / US | |||
Former [2019/41] | For all designated states ImmunoMolecular Therapeutics, LLC 3513 S. Brighton Blvd., Suite 431 Denver, CO 80216 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado, a body corporate 1800 Grant Street, 8th Floor Denver, CO 80203 / US | |||
Former [2019/05] | For all designated states IM Therapeutics 11001 West 120th Avenue Suite 400 Broomfield, CO 80023 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado, a body corporate 1800 Grant Street, 8th Floor Denver, CO 80203 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTTLIEB, Peter, A. 5413 S. Geneva Way Englewood, CO 80111 / US | 02 /
MICHELS, Aaron 14935 East Wagontrial Drive Aurora, CO 80015 / US | 03 /
ORNDORFF, Steve 4580 Augusta Drive Broomfield, CO 80023 / US | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Witthoff Jaekel Steinecke Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 1140 52412 Jülich / DE | [2023/02] |
Former [2019/05] | Steinecke, Peter Müller Fottner Steinecke Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB P.O. Box 1140 52412 Jülich / DE | Application number, filing date | 17715858.1 | 22.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017US23571 | Priority number, date | US201662312702P | 24.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662312702 P | [2019/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017165508 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3432877 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3432877 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/198, A61K45/06, A61K38/28, A61P3/10, A61P37/00 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/28, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | D-ALPHA-METHYLDOPA ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN | [2022/32] | English: | D-ALPHA-METHYLDOPA FOR TREATING AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE | [2022/32] | French: | D-ALPHA-MÉTHYLDOPA POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIE AUTO-IMMUNE | [2022/32] |
Former [2019/05] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [2019/05] | METHODS OF TREATING AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE | ||
Former [2019/05] | MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE AUTO-IMMUNE | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 17.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2023 | CZ | 11.01.2023 | DK | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | ES | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | HR | 11.01.2023 | IT | 11.01.2023 | LT | 11.01.2023 | LV | 11.01.2023 | MC | 11.01.2023 | NL | 11.01.2023 | PL | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | RS | 11.01.2023 | SE | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | SM | 11.01.2023 | IE | 22.03.2023 | LU | 22.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | NO | 11.04.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | IS | 11.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
IE | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 22.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
IE | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 22.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
IE | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
LU | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
MC | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 11.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005085323 (PEPTIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * claims 1,13,18,19,40,46-57,90 *; | [A]WO2012162697 (UNIV COLORADO REGENTS [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2016191634 (UNIV COLORADO REGENTS [US], et al) [XP] 1-33* page 10, lines 4-19; figures 1-4; claims 1-35 *; | [X] - AMES M M ET AL, "Stereochemical course in vivo of alpha-methyldopa decarboxylation in rat brains", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, US, vol. 26, no. 19, doi:10.1016/0006-2952(77)90342-2, ISSN 0006-2952, (19771001), pages 1757 - 1762, (19771001), XP023728982 [X] 24-27 * abstract * * page 1757, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 1758, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(77)90342-2 | [X] - A. SJOERDSMA ET AL, "Studies on the Metabolism and Mechanism of Action of Methyldopa", CIRCULATION, US, (19631001), vol. 28, no. 4, doi:10.1161/01.CIR.28.4.492, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 492 - 502, XP055379684 [X] 24-27 * page 492, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 492, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 493, column l, paragraph 2 * * table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.28.4.492 | [A] - AG RENWICK ET AL, "The absorption and conjugation of methyldopa in patients with coeliac and Crohn's diseases during treatment.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY., GB, (19830701), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2125.1983.tb02147.x, ISSN 0306-5251, pages 77 - 83, XP055379184 [A] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2125.1983.tb02147.x | by applicant | WO9401775 | WO9429696 | US5415994 | US5424193 | US6001567 | WO9967641 | US2011245334 | - GILLESPIE ET AL., "Clinical and Chemical Studies with a-Methyl-Dopa in Patients with Hypertension", CIRCULATION, (1962), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1161/01.CIR.25.2.281, pages 281 - 291, XP055379679 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.25.2.281 | - SJOERDSMA ET AL., "Studies on the Metabolism and Mechanism of Action of Methyldopa", CIRCULATION, (1963), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1161/01.CIR.28.4.492, pages 492 - 502, XP055379684 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.28.4.492 | - AU ET AL., "The Metabolism of C-Labelled ?-Methyldopa in Normal and Hypertensive Human Subjects", BIOCHEM. J., (1972), vol. 129, pages 1 - 10 | - RENWICK ET AL., "The Absorption and Conjugation of Methyldopa in Patients with Coeliac and Crohn's Diseases During Treatment", BR. J. CLIN. PHARMAC., (1983), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-2125.1983.tb02147.x, pages 77 - 83, XP055379184 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2125.1983.tb02147.x | - Optical Resolution Procedures for Chemical Compounds, OPTICAL RESOLUTION INFORMATION CENTER | - MARTENS, J. ET AL., "Resolution of Optical Isomers by Thin-Layer Chromatography: Enantiomeric Purity of Methyldopa", ARCH. PHARM. (WEINHEIM, (1986), vol. 319, pages 572 - 74 | - GELBER, L.R.; NEUMEYER, J.L., "Determination of the Enantiomeric Purity of Levodopa, Methyldopa, Carbidopa and Tryptophan by the Use of Chiral Mobile Phase High-Performance Liquid Chromatography", J. CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1983), vol. 257, pages 317 - 26, XP026787351 | - OLIVIER, M., "The Invader assay for SNP Genotyping", MUTAT. RES., (20050603), vol. 573, no. 1-2, pages 103 - 110 | - "PCR Protocols: A Guide to Methods and Applications and Bustin SA 2000", INNIS M A ET AL., Journal of Molecular Endocrinology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), pages 169 - 193 |