Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11043866 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2021 | B2 | US2019312475 | 10.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016208770 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP58272 | 06.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109155549B | Global Dossier | 16.06.2020 | B | CN109155549 | 04.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102016208770 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP58272 | 06.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3459157 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016208770 | 20.05.2016 | WO2017EP58272 | 06.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017198389 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016208770 | 20.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102016208770 | 11.10.2018 | B4 | DE102016208770 | 23.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016208770 | 20.05.2016 |