EP3459157 - ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNA Powertrain GmbH & Co KG Industriestrasse 35 8502 Lannach / AT | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIDL, Gerhard Joseph Haydngasse 12 2603 Felixdorf / AT | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Zangger, Bernd Magna International Europe GmbH Patentabteilung Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317 8041 Graz / AT | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 17715929.0 | 06.04.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017EP58272 | Priority number, date | DE201610208770 | 20.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016208770 | [2019/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017198389 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3459157 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/26, H02K1/32, H02K9/19, H02K17/16 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
H02K1/32 (EP,US);
H02K1/26 (EP,US);
H02K1/30 (US);
H02K17/16 (US);
H02K17/168 (EP,US);
H02K9/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE | [2019/13] | English: | ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2019/13] | French: | MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 16.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3629628 (RANK WILLIAM E, et al); | [X]DE102012220239 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]); | [X]DE102013020331 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [X]DE102014018223 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) |