EP3432719 - METHOD FOR MEASURING MASS DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states König Maschinen Gesellschaft mbH Statteggerstrasse 80 8045 Graz / AT | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAUFER, Wolfgang Rueppgasse 24/9 1020 Wien / AT | 02 /
HEFNER, Josef Weiherweg 16 91602 Dürrwangen / AT | 03 /
THORMÄHLEN, Johann Deichreihe 13 25377 Kollmar / DE | 04 /
SÖNNICHSEN, Dieter Kleine Bergstraße 8 25712 Burg / DE | 05 /
STELZER, Hannes Weidenweg 3 Lannach 8502 / AT | 06 /
MAIER, Gernot Bierbaumstrasse 25A 8075 Hart bei Graz / AT | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 17716098.3 | 23.03.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017AT60074 | Priority number, date | AT20160000157 | 24.03.2016 Original published format: AT 1572016 | AT20160000158 | 24.03.2016 Original published format: AT 1582016 | AT20160050553 | 17.06.2016 Original published format: AT 505532016 | [2019/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017161399 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3432719 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3432719 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A21C5/00, G01G11/04 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
G01G11/04 (EP,US);
A21C3/02 (AT,US);
A21C3/10 (AT);
A21C5/00 (EP,AT,US);
A21C9/08 (AT);
B65G13/00 (AT);
B65G15/00 (AT);
E04B1/2604 (EP,US);
G01G11/00 (AT);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER MASSENVERTEILUNG | [2019/05] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING MASS DISTRIBUTION | [2019/05] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR MÉSURER LA DISTRIBUTION DE MASSE | [2020/19] |
Former [2019/05] | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE LA DISTRIBUTION EN MASSE | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 19.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/28] | Request for further processing for: | 04.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 04.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2017 | AL | 05.08.2020 | CY | 05.08.2020 | CZ | 05.08.2020 | DK | 05.08.2020 | EE | 05.08.2020 | FI | 05.08.2020 | HR | 05.08.2020 | LT | 05.08.2020 | LV | 05.08.2020 | MC | 05.08.2020 | MK | 05.08.2020 | MT | 05.08.2020 | RO | 05.08.2020 | RS | 05.08.2020 | SI | 05.08.2020 | SK | 05.08.2020 | SM | 05.08.2020 | BG | 05.11.2020 | GR | 06.11.2020 | IS | 05.12.2020 | PT | 07.12.2020 | IE | 23.03.2021 | LU | 23.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 23.03.2017 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
MK | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 23.03.2017 | |
AL | 05.08.2020 | ||
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CY | 05.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2021 | ||
LU | 23.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
IE | 23.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
MC | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SI | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SK | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 05.08.2020 | |
CZ | 05.08.2020 | ||
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 05.08.2020 | |
DK | 05.08.2020 | ||
EE | 05.08.2020 | ||
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
RO | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
SM | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 05.08.2020 | |
FI | 05.08.2020 | ||
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
HR | 05.08.2020 | ||
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
LV | 05.08.2020 | ||
RS | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
IS | 05.12.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
GR | 06.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | ||
BG | 05.11.2020 | ||
PT | 07.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 05.08.2020 | |
LT | 05.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3850023 (MCDONALD R) [X] 7,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4526244 (CHAUVEAU JEAN-MARIE [CH]) [Y] 1-6,11 * column 1, line 13 *; | [A]DE10136980 (FRITSCH A GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]US2014034448 (VAN BLOKLAND JOHANNES JOSEPHUS ANTONIUS [NL]) [X] 7-10,13,14 * the whole document *; | [XAY]EP2846140 (RADIE BV [NL]) [X] 7,8,10,12,14 * figures 2, 4 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0 30] , [0 31] * [A] 9,13 [Y] 1-6,11 |