EP3442491 - SURFACE MODIFIED EFFECT PIGMENT AND NAIL VARNISH COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/08] | SURFACE-MODIFIED EFFECT PIGMENT AND NAIL VARNISH COMPOSITION | ||
[2020/41] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECKART GmbH Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEBHARD, Ann-Katrin ALTANA CHEMIE GmbH - Patentabteilung - Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE | 02 /
PIPPINGER, Christina c/o ALTANA CHEMIE - Patente Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Ulrich c/o ALTANA CHEMIE - Patente Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE | 04 /
SCHILLING, Christine c/o ALTANA CHEMIE - Patente Güntersthal 4 91235 Hartenstein / DE | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Strych, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | Altana IP Department Altana Management Services GmbH Abelstraße 45 46483 Wesel / DE | Application number, filing date | 17716285.6 | 13.04.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017EP58980 | Priority number, date | EP20160000855 | 15.04.2016 Original published format: EP 16000855 | [2019/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017178610 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3442491 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3442491 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/26, C09C1/64, C09C1/00, C09C1/62, C09C1/66 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
C09C1/644 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/0254 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/55 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/72 (EP,US);
A61K8/8117 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q3/02 (EP,KR,US);
C09C1/0015 (EP,US);
C09C1/627 (EP,US);
C09C1/642 (EP,US);
C09C1/648 (EP,US);
C09C1/66 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/436 (US);
A61K2800/612 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/651 (US);
A61K2800/805 (US);
C01P2004/20 (US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/60 (EP,US);
C09C2200/102 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENMODIFIZIERTES EFFEKTPIGMENT UND NAGELLACKKOMPOSITION | [2019/08] | English: | SURFACE MODIFIED EFFECT PIGMENT AND NAIL VARNISH COMPOSITION | [2020/41] | French: | PIGMENT A EFFET A SURFACE MODIFIE ET COMPOSITION DE VERNIS A ONGLES | [2020/41] |
Former [2019/08] | SURFACE-MODIFIED EFFECT PIGMENT AND NAIL VARNISH COMPOSITION | ||
Former [2019/08] | PIGMENT À EFFET À SURFACE MODIFIÉE ET COMPOSITION DE VERNIS À ONGLES | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 15.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP20176997.3 / EP3738577 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.11.2021
Schlenk Metallic Pigments GmbH Barnsdorfer Hauptstrasse 5 91154 Roth - Barnsdorf / DE Opponent's representative Heinemann, Monica Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastraße 17 81925 München / DE | [2021/52] | 08.12.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.04.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.05.2023 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2023/42] | 09.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.06.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.06.2023 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2017 | AL | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | CZ | 24.02.2021 | DK | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | ES | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | MK | 24.02.2021 | MT | 24.02.2021 | NL | 24.02.2021 | PL | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SE | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | TR | 24.02.2021 | IE | 13.04.2021 | LU | 13.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | GB | 24.05.2021 | NO | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | PT | 24.06.2021 | AT | 13.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
TR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GB | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GB | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GB | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 13.04.2017 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GB | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GB | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GB | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GB | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
GB | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 13.04.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | CZ | 24.02.2021 | |
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
LU | 13.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 24.02.2021 | |
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | CZ | 24.02.2021 | |
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19820112 (ECKART STANDARD BRONZEPULVER [DE]) [A] 1-22 * page 2, line 45 - page 4 ** examples 1-10 *; | [XAI]DE102005036333 (ECKART GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 4,5,8-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 7] - paragraph [0057]; example 1 * [A] 22 [I] 1-3,6,7; | [XA]DE102007034928 (ECKART GMBH [DE]) [X] 4,5,9-11,15-21 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] , [0160] - paragraphs [0162] , [0205]; example 20; table 5 * [A] 1-3,6-8,12-14,22; | [XDA]US2010047199 (TRUMMER STEFAN [DE], et al) [XD] 4,5,9-22 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0023] - paragraph [0152]; examples 8-10; table 4 * * examples 8,10 * * table 4 * [A] 1-3,6-8 | by applicant | EP0289240 | EP0723997 | WO9638505 | EP1082952 | EP1251152 | EP1299066 | EP1462085 | WO2004087816 | WO2005049739 | EP1746913 | EP1792598 | EP1796794 | EP1812518 | WO2007148758 | WO2008077612 | EP1980594 | WO2009152941 | EP1829833 | WO2010024283 | WO2010086165 | EP2217664 | EP2227508 | EP2248514 | EP1796794 | EP2318463 | EP2346950 | EP2346949 | EP2356181 | EP2367889 | JP2012081236 | CN102718229 | EP2042474 | EP2576702 | US2014251184 | Opposition | FR2776512 | US2004194663 | US2007020205 | DE102005036333 | DE102007034928 | FR2939678 |