EP3435878 - IMAGING ASSEMBLY FOR INTRAVASCULAR IMAGING DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS OF ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/06] | IMAGING ASSEMBLY FOR INTRAVASCULAR IMAGING DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | ||
[2022/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/06] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAS, Maritess c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SAROHA, Princeton c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
STIGALL, Jeremy c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
WROLSTAD, David Kenneth c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/19] |
Former [2019/06] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 17716305.2 | 23.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017IB51681 | Priority number, date | US201662315395P | 30.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662315395 P | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017168290 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3435878 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3435878 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/12, A61B8/00 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/0891 (EP,US);
A61B8/0883 (EP);
A61B8/445 (EP,US);
A61B8/4488 (US);
A61B8/54 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR VORRICHTUNG ZUR INTRAVASKULÄREN BILDGEBUNG SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE | [2022/51] | English: | IMAGING ASSEMBLY FOR INTRAVASCULAR IMAGING DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS OF ASSEMBLY | [2022/51] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'IMAGERIE POUR DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE INTRAVASCULAIRE ET DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS DE MONTAGE | [2022/51] |
Former [2019/06] | BILDGEBUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR VORRICHTUNG ZUR INTRAVASKULÄREN BILDGEBUNG SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2019/06] | IMAGING ASSEMBLY FOR INTRAVASCULAR IMAGING DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | ||
Former [2019/06] | ENSEMBLE D'IMAGERIE POUR DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE INTRAVASCULAIRE ET DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 30.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE9402697U (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004044286 (HOSSACK NORMAN HUGH [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009030312 (HADJICOSTIS ANDREAS [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009318003 (HOSSACK NORMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [IA]US2015305710 (STIGALL JEREMY [US], et al) [I] 7-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0009] - [0023] - [0032]; figure -; claim - * [A] 1-6,18-25; | [XAI]US2016007962 (ESBECK THOMAS [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] - [0012] - [0041] - [0065]; figure -; claim - * [A] 7-17 [I] 2-6,18-25 | Examination | DE9402697U | by applicant | US6641540 | US6776763 | US7226417 | US7846101 |