EP3439484 - FROZEN DISPENSING MACHINE HEAT TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taylor Commercial Foodservice, LLC 750 N. Blackhawk Boulevard Rockton, IL 61072 / US | [2020/38] |
Former [2019/07] | For all designated states Taylor Commercial Foodservice, Inc. 750 N. Blackhawk Boulevard Rockton, Illinois 61072 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WADLE, Stephen M. 750 N. Blackhawk Blvd. Rockton Illinois 61072 / US | 02 /
MINARD, James J. 750 N. Blackhawk Blvd. Rockton Illinois 61072 / US | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Finch, Steven Caffall Novagraaf UK 3rd Floor 77 Gracechurch Street London EC3V 0AS / GB | [2023/18] |
Former [2019/07] | Harris, Oliver John Richard Novagraaf UK Centrum Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17716761.6 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017US25360 | Priority number, date | US201662319422P | 07.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662319422 P | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017176580 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439484 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3439484 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/28, A23G9/30 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
A23G9/28 (EP,US);
A23G9/305 (US);
A23G9/281 (EP,US);
A23G9/30 (EP,US);
A23L3/16 (US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN FÜR GEFRORENE AUSGABEMASCHINE | [2019/07] | English: | FROZEN DISPENSING MACHINE HEAT TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2019/07] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE POUR MACHINE DISTRIBUTRICE D'ALIMENTS CONGELÉS | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 03.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 04.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23170190.5 / EP4226771 | EP24186213.5 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4522041 (MENZEL WALDEMAR [DE]); | [X]US4680944 (MENZEL WALDEMAR [DE]); | [X]WO2009027757 (BRAVO SPA [IT], et al); | [XYI]WO2014188351 (CARPIGIANI GROUP ALI SPA [IT]); | [XYI]EP2936992 (CARPIGIANI GROUP ALI SPA [IT]) |