EP3400636 - CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AND MEASURING A CURRENT IN A CHARGE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicon Line GmbH Landsberger Str. 314 / III Rgb. 80687 München / DE | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELLINGRATH, Thomas Altbuchhorster Str. 36 c 15537 Gruenheide (Mark) / DE | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Andreas, et al RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 33 02 11 80062 München / DE | [2018/46] | Application number, filing date | 17717069.3 | 04.01.2017 | [2018/46] | WO2017DE100003 | Priority number, date | EP20160150111 | 04.01.2016 Original published format: EP 16150111 | [2018/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017118455 | Date: | 13.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3400636 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3400636 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/068, H01S5/042, H05B45/32, H05B45/345, G05F1/10 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
H01S5/06808 (EP,US);
G01R19/0092 (US);
G05F1/10 (EP,US);
H01S5/026 (US);
H01S5/0261 (US);
H01S5/0427 (EP,US);
H01S5/068 (US);
H01S5/042 (US);
H03K2217/0027 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | H01S5/068, H01S5/042, H05B33/08, G01R19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN UND MESSEN EINES STROMS IN EINEM LASTELEMENT | [2018/46] | English: | CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AND MEASURING A CURRENT IN A CHARGE ELEMENT | [2018/46] | French: | CIRCUIT ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET DE MESURE D'UN COURANT DANS UN ÉLÉMENT DE CHARGE | [2018/46] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 06.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.03.2022 | CZ | 09.03.2022 | DK | 09.03.2022 | EE | 09.03.2022 | ES | 09.03.2022 | FI | 09.03.2022 | HR | 09.03.2022 | IT | 09.03.2022 | LT | 09.03.2022 | LV | 09.03.2022 | MC | 09.03.2022 | PL | 09.03.2022 | RO | 09.03.2022 | RS | 09.03.2022 | SE | 09.03.2022 | SI | 09.03.2022 | SK | 09.03.2022 | SM | 09.03.2022 | BG | 09.06.2022 | NO | 09.06.2022 | GR | 10.06.2022 | IS | 09.07.2022 | PT | 11.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/35] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | CZ | 09.03.2022 | |
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | CZ | 09.03.2022 | |
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 09.03.2022 | |
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 09.03.2022 | |
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 09.03.2022 | |
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.03.2022 | |
NO | 09.06.2022 |