|
17.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2020 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Comments on Written Opinion of ISA |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.09.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.06.2017 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |