Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019073893 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITUA20161524 | 10.03.2016 | WO2017IT00033 | 22.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3427500 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITUA20161524 | 10.03.2016 | WO2017IT00033 | 22.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017154030 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITUA20161524 | 10.03.2016 |