13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
02.04.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
24.12.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
26.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
23.04.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
17.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.03.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.03.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.10.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.10.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
27.05.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.04.2020 |
Change - German title |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
24.04.2020 |
Change - English title |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
24.04.2020 |
Change - French title |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
22.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.01.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.08.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.08.2019 |
First examination report |
|
14.06.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.01.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
18.01.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
18.01.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
19.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for validation state |
|
30.11.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
16.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
12.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|