Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11298362 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2022 | B2 | US2021213029 | 15.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US26134 | 05.04.2017 | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 | US201716093123 | 05.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102418765B | Global Dossier | 08.07.2022 | B1 | KR20180129918 | 05.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US26134 | 05.04.2017 | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7288482B | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | B2 | JP2021176858 | 11.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018553357 | 05.04.2017 | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6911047B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2021 | B2 | JP2019511526 | 25.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US26134 | 05.04.2017 | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109310684B | Global Dossier | 19.11.2021 | B | CN109310684 | 05.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US26134 | 05.04.2017 | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3020875 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US26134 | 05.04.2017 | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017249078B | Global Dossier | 20.10.2022 | B2 | AU2017249078 | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US26134 | 05.04.2017 | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3442529 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2021 | B1 | EP3442529 | 20.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US26134 | 05.04.2017 | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2881801T | 30.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US26134 | 05.04.2017 | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018012457 | 07.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US26134 | 05.04.2017 | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2747788 | 14.05.2021 | C2 | RU2018138627 | 10.06.2020 | A3 | RU2018138627 | 12.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US26134 | 05.04.2017 | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017180389 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662321311 | 12.04.2016 |