EP3437238 - TECHNIQUES FOR CONFIGURING UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL TRANSMISSIONS IN A SHARED RADIO FREQUENCY SPECTRUM BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YERRAMALLI, Srinivas 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GAAL, Peter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/06] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17718177.3 | 29.03.2017 | [2019/06] | WO2017US24658 | Priority number, date | US201662315626P | 30.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662315626 P | US201715471524 | 28.03.2017 Original published format: US201715471524 | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017172857 | Date: | 05.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3437238 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04W16/14, H04W24/10 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/1864 (CN,US);
H04W72/21 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0041 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0057 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/0446 (CN,US);
H04W72/23 (CN,US);
H04W72/542 (CN,US);
H04W16/14 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURATION VON UPLINK-KANALÜBERTRAGUNGEN IN EINEM GEMEINSAM GENUTZTEN FUNKFREQUENZSPEKTRUMSBÄNDERN | [2019/06] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR CONFIGURING UPLINK CONTROL CHANNEL TRANSMISSIONS IN A SHARED RADIO FREQUENCY SPECTRUM BAND | [2019/06] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE CONFIGURATION DE TRANSMISSIONS DE CANAL DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UNE BANDE À SPECTRE RADIOFRÉQUENCE PARTAGÉ | [2019/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 02.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2010148319 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [Y] 9,17,24,29 * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0081] * * figures 6,13 *[A] 1-8,10-16,18-23,25-28,30; | [XAI]US2012294252 (KWON YEONG HYEON [KR], et al) [X] 1,6,12,19,22,26 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0171] * * figure 14 * [A] 2-5,11,13-15,18,20,21,27,30 [I] 7; | [XAI]US2013121270 (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,12,14,19,21,26 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0078] * * figures 1,6,9,10 * [A] 2,6,7,11,13,18,20,22,27,30 [I] 4,15; | [XA]US2016036578 (MALLADI DURGA PRASAD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13,18-20,26,27,30 * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0170] * * figures 1,2,6,7,8,12 * [A] 3-7,14,15,21,22; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (Release 13)", (20160326), 3GPP DRAFT; DRAFT_36331-D10_UPDATE1_WITH_REV_MARKS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/Specifications/201603_draft_specs_after_RAN_71/, (20160326), XP051081600 [A] 1-7,11-15,18-22,26,27,30 * page 329 * | [XAYI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "PUCCH design details", vol. RAN WG1, no. St. Julian's, Malta; 20160215 - 20160219, (20160214), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-160888 PUCCH DESIGN DETAILS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160214), XP051054212 [X] 1,2,6,7,10-13,18-20,22,25-27,30 * sec.2-5; page 1 - page 3 * [A] 3,4,14,15 [Y] 9,17,24,29 [I] 5,8,16,21,23,28 |