EP3443683 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BEAM MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISLAM, Muhammad Nazmul c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
LUO, Tao c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
CEZANNE, Juergen c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Sundar c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
SAMPATH, Ashwin c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
SADIQ, Bilal c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
LI, Junyi c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2024/01] |
Former [2019/08] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17718215.1 | 31.03.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017US25572 | Priority number, date | US201662322168P | 13.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662322168 P | US201662329180P | 28.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662329180 P | US201662333120P | 06.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662333120 P | US201662337829P | 17.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662337829 P | US201662338484P | 18.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662338484 P | US201662341051P | 24.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662341051 P | US201762447386P | 17.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762447386 P | US201715474829 | 30.03.2017 Original published format: US201715474829 | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017180335 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3443683 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3443683 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0417, H04B7/06 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
H04B7/0417 (EP,US);
H04W72/046 (CN);
H04B7/0639 (US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0621 (EP,US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/088 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (CN,US);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/0053 (CN);
H04L5/0057 (CN);
H04W72/21 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STRAHLVERWALTUNG | [2019/08] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BEAM MANAGEMENT | [2019/08] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE GESTION DE FAISCEAU | [2019/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 11.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2014192917 (NAM YOUNG-HAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2015060681 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [A]AU2014230299 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [P]US2016211902 (PARK JONGHYUN [KR], et al) | Examination | WO2015126130 | US2016099763 | US2017012692 |