EP3541880 - LABELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HP Indigo B.V. Startbaan 16 1187 XR Amstelveen / NL | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TZOMIK, Inna Einstein 10 Kiryat Weizmann 76101 Ness Ziona / IL | 02 /
SKVIRSKY, Daniel Einstein 10 Kiryat Weizmann 76101 Ness Ziona / IL | 03 /
KOGAN, Faina Einstein 10 Kiryat Weizmann 76101 Ness Ziona / IL | 04 /
STOLOV, Alexander Einstein 10 Kiryat Weizmann 76101 Ness Ziona / IL | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/39] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17718366.2 | 19.04.2017 | [2019/39] | WO2017EP59299 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018192651 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541880 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G03G8/00, C09D11/101, G03G9/00, G03G9/13 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
G03G8/00 (EP);
G03G9/08773 (US);
G03G9/13 (EP);
G03G9/131 (EP);
G03G9/132 (EP);
G03G9/1355 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/39] | C09D11/101, G03G9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | ETIKETTEN | [2019/39] | English: | LABELS | [2019/39] | French: | ÉTIQUETTES | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 17.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/17] | 06.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0823670 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-4,6-9,12-15 * claims 4,6,7 * * page 6, line 34 - line 36 * * examples * * page 6, line 54 - page 7, line 5 * [I] 5,10,11; | [X]WO2009080626 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15 * claims 1,3,12,16,17 * * page 38, line 12 * * page 39, lines 11-14 * * page 11, line 12 *; | [A]US2012231237 (RON HANNOCH [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-7 * * table 1 ** examples 4,5 * | by applicant | WO2007130069 |