EP3606700 - POLISHING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR POLISHING OPTICAL WAVEGUIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Euromicron Werkzeuge GmbH Zur Dornheck 32-34 35764 Sinn-Fleisbach / DE | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERNER, Christoph Ringstrasse 9 35649 Bischoffen / DE | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/07] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 17718842.2 | 03.04.2017 | [2020/07] | WO2017EP57885 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018184658 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606700 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B24B19/22, B24B57/02, B24B53/017, B24C1/00, B24C3/22 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
B24B53/017 (EP,US);
B24B19/226 (EP,US);
B24C1/003 (EP);
B24C3/22 (EP);
B24C3/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Title | German: | POLIERMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM POLIEREN VON LICHTWELLENLEITERN | [2020/07] | English: | POLISHING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR POLISHING OPTICAL WAVEGUIDES | [2020/07] | French: | MACHINE DE POLISSAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE POLISSAGE DE GUIDES D'ONDES OPTIQUES | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 22.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6012968 (LOFARO MICHAEL F [US]) [Y] 1-21 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 28; figures 1,2; claims 11,18,19 *; | [Y]US6102785 (CHANDLER WILLIAM KEITH [US], et al) [Y] 10-12 * figures 2-6 *; | [Y]JP2000354948 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP) [Y] 1-21 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2004056532 (SAGITTA ENGINEERING SOLUTIONS [IL], et al) [Y] 1-21 * paragraphs [0005] , [0018] , [0036] , [0059] , [0082] - [0086]; figures 3-10; claims 1,4 *; | [Y]WO2015049829 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [Y] 7,13,14,20* figure 3 *; | [Y]CN106239356 (YTDIAMOND CO LTD) [Y] 3-6,8,9 * abstract * |