EP3446197 - PRESSURE SENSITIVE STYLUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERETZ, Ahia MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
MISHALOV, Vadim MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17719120.2 | 11.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017US26881 | Priority number, date | US201615133521 | 20.04.2016 Original published format: US201615133521 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017184373 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3446197 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3446197 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0354 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
G06F3/03545 (EP,US);
G06F3/0383 (US);
G06F3/0441 (EP,US);
G06F3/0442 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKEMPFINDLICHER STIFT | [2019/09] | English: | PRESSURE SENSITIVE STYLUS | [2019/09] | French: | STYLET SENSIBLE À LA PRESSION | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 12.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2017 | AL | 04.03.2020 | AT | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | IT | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | NL | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | TR | 04.03.2020 | IE | 11.04.2020 | LU | 11.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 11.04.2017 | |
AL | 04.03.2020 | ||
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 11.04.2020 | ||
LU | 11.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.04.2017 | |
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 11.04.2020 | ||
LU | 11.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
IE | 11.04.2020 | ||
LU | 11.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 11.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 11.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2015317001 (BEN-BASSAT DAN [IL], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0008] - [0025] - [0042] - [0044] - [0048] , [0049] , [0055] - [0062] - [0069] - [0071] - [0074] , [0075] , [0085] * |