EP3442449 - SUBCUTANEOUS IMPLANT INTEGRATED INSTRUMENT WITH POCKET CREATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardiac Pacemakers, Inc. 4100 Hamline Avenue North St. Paul, MN 55112-5798 / US | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBEAU, Serge 3045 Alvarado Lane North Plymouth, Minnesota 55447 / US | 02 /
THOMPSON, Tyler 9709 42nd Street Northeast St. Michael, Minnesota 55376 / US | 03 /
SICK, Kathryn 469 Arden Circle Shoreview, Minnesota 55126 / US | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2019/08] | Application number, filing date | 17719138.4 | 12.04.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017US27279 | Priority number, date | US201662322236P | 13.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662322236 P | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017180792 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3442449 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3442449 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61N1/372 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
A61B17/3468 (EP,US);
A61N1/372 (EP,US);
A61B2017/347 (EP,US);
A61B2560/063 (US);
A61M37/0069 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTRUMENT MIT INTEGRIERTEM SUBKUTANEM IMPLANTAT MIT TASCHENFORMER | [2019/08] | English: | SUBCUTANEOUS IMPLANT INTEGRATED INSTRUMENT WITH POCKET CREATOR | [2019/08] | French: | INSTRUMENT INTÉGRÉ D'IMPLANT SOUS-CUTANÉ PRÉSENTANT UN CRÉATEUR DE POCHE | [2019/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 09.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22159617.4 / EP4029463 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | ES | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5304119 (BALABAN STEPHEN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,15 * column 4, lines 17-22,30-68 - column 5, lines 1-29; figures 1-3 * [I] 14; | [XAI]US6939318 (STENZEL ERIC B [IE]) [X] 1-3,12,13,15 * column 2, lines 54-67 - column 3, lines 1-18,49-66; figures 2-3 * * column 4, lines 10-46 * [A] 4-10,14 [I] 11; | [XAI]US2011184449 (LUBOCK PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11,15 * paragraphs [0045] , [0049] - [0050]; figures 1a,2a-c * [A] 5-7,14 [I] 12,13; | [X]US2014276928 (VANDERPOOL MATTHEW T [US], et al) [X] 1,11,15* paragraphs [0004] , [0032] , [0038] - [0040]; figures 1,5a-b * | Examination | US2010331868 |