|
22.06.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.07.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
01.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
15.02.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
112 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
85 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
30.08.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
30.08.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.08.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
38 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
20 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |