13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
06.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
24.06.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
16.07.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
16.07.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
10.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.07.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.10.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
30.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
12.07.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
21.06.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
08.02.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
08.02.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
17.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.10.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.10.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
23.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|