EP3458814 - VIBRATION-TYPE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser Flowtec AG Kägenstrasse 7 4153 Reinach / CH | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEDER, Alfred Buchenstrasse 9 84032 Landshut / DE | 02 /
ECKERT, Gerhard Serrnussweg 7A 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | 03 /
BITTO, Ennio A.v. Blarerweg 11 4147 Aesch / CH | 04 /
ZHU, Hao Auenstrasse 235 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/30] |
Former [2019/13] | 01 /
RIEDER, Alfred Buchenstrasse 9 84032 Landshut / DE | ||
02 /
ECKERT, Gerhard Serrnussweg 7A 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | |||
03 /
BITTO, Ennio Av. Blarerweg 11 4147 Aesch / CH | |||
04 /
ZHU, Hao Auenstrasse 235 85354 Freising / DE | Representative(s) | Hahn, Christian, et al Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland)AG +Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [2023/30] |
Former [2019/13] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 17719616.9 | 27.04.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017EP60076 | Priority number, date | DE201610109251 | 19.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016109251 | [2019/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017198439 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458814 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3458814 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/84 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
G01F1/8409 (EP,US);
G01N29/222 (US);
G01F1/8413 (US);
G01F1/8422 (EP,US);
G01F1/8472 (US);
G01F1/8477 (EP,US);
G01N29/02 (US);
G01N9/002 (US);
G01N2291/014 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSAUFNEHMER VOM VIBRATIONSTYP | [2019/13] | English: | VIBRATION-TYPE SENSOR | [2019/13] | French: | CAPTEUR DE MESURE DU TYPE À VIBRATIONS | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 02.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 28.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1130367 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 8, paragraph [0018] - column 9, paragraph [0024] * * column 10, paragraph [0034] - column 11, paragraph [0038] ** figures 1, 2 *; | [X]EP1729099 (OVAL CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph [0016] - column 8, paragraph [0042] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [XI]US2011036179 (WEINSTEIN JOEL [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8,10-12 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph [0059] - page 5, paragraph [0084] * * page 7, paragraph [0113] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 3-5,9 | by applicant | DE102015112737 |