EP3445477 - SEPARATION MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imperial College Innovations Limited Level 1 Faculty Building c/o Imperial College Exhibition Road London SW7 2AZ / GB | [2019/42] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states Imperial Innovations Limited 52 Princes Gate Exhibition Road London SW7 2PG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Bo Imperial Innovations Limited 52 Princes Gate Exhibition Road London SW7 2PG / GB | 02 /
JI, Jing Imperial Innovations Limited 52 Princes Gate Exhibition Road London SW7 2PG / GB | 03 /
LI, Kang Imperial Innovations Limited 52 Princes Gate Exhibition Road London SW7 2PG / GB | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17719691.2 | 19.04.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017GB51089 | Priority number, date | GB20160006988 | 21.04.2016 Original published format: GB 201606988 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017182801 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3445477 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/14, B01D67/00, B01D71/34 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
B01D67/00135 (EP,US);
B01D61/14 (EP,US);
B01D67/00111 (EP,US);
B01D71/34 (EP,US);
B01D2323/082 (EP,US);
B01D2323/12 (EP,US);
B01D2323/219 (EP);
B01D2325/028 (US);
B01D2325/0283 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Title | German: | TRENNMEMBRANEN | [2019/09] | English: | SEPARATION MEMBRANES | [2019/09] | French: | MEMBRANES DE SÉPARATION | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 19.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/14] | 22.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2019 | 30.04.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP2008706 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2009097745 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN], et al); | [XYI]US2014210118 (LEE JONGHWI [KR], et al) |