|
30.10.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.11.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
31.07.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2018 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
16 |
|
06.04.2018 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
06.04.2018 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.02.2018 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.02.2018 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
12.02.2018 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
12.02.2018 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
24.01.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
11.07.2017 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
24 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |