EP3440411 - AIR COOLED CHILLER HYDRONIC KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERRAZ, Gregory 7 Rue Saint Jacques 69003 Lyon / FR | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2024/33] |
Former [2019/07] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17720319.7 | 07.04.2017 | [2019/07] | WO2017US26665 | Priority number, date | US201662319343P | 07.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662319343 P | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017177172 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3440411 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3440411 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F24F5/00, F24F11/30, F24F11/84, F24F110/12, F24F110/40, F24F140/20 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
F24F11/84 (EP,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F5/0003 (EP);
F24D2220/0278 (EP,US);
F24F11/43 (EP,US);
F24F2110/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | F24F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTGEKÜHLTES HYDRONISCHES KÜHLSYSTE | [2024/13] | English: | AIR COOLED CHILLER HYDRONIC KIT | [2019/07] | French: | SYSTÈME HYDRONIQUE REFROIDISSEUR REDROIDI À L'AIR | [2024/13] |
Former [2019/07] | HYDROPONIK-KIT FÜR LUFTGEKÜHLTEN KÜHLER | ||
Former [2019/07] | KIT HYDRONIQUE DE REFROIDISSEUR REFROIDI À L'AIR | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 06.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2021487 (KIEL KARL); | [XAI]JP2001193952 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [XAYI]JP2014016090 (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK) | Examination | US2015135752 |