EP3449201 - SELF-LOADING PISTOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B&T AG Tempelstrasse 6 3608 Thun / CH | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜGGER, Karl Allmendingen Allee 1s 3608 Thun / CH | [2019/10] | Representative(s) | Wittmann, Ernst-Ulrich, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Kaulbachstrasse 114 80802 München / DE | [2020/16] |
Former [2019/10] | Wittmann, Ernst-Ulrich, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Steinerstrasse 15/A 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17720762.8 | 26.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017EP59962 | Priority number, date | DE201610107806 | 27.04.2016 Original published format: DE102016107806 | [2019/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017186807 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3449201 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3449201 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F41C23/04, F41C23/12, F41A3/66 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
F41C23/04 (EP,US);
F41A3/66 (EP,US);
F41C23/12 (EP,US);
F41C27/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTLADENDE PISTOLE | [2019/10] | English: | SELF-LOADING PISTOL | [2019/10] | French: | PISTOLET À CHARGEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 27.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2017 | AL | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | DK | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | IT | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | RS | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | SM | 15.04.2020 | TR | 15.04.2020 | IE | 26.04.2020 | LU | 26.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | FR | 15.06.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | NO | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | IS | 15.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.04.2017 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 26.04.2020 | ||
LU | 26.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 15.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 26.04.2020 | ||
LU | 26.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 15.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 26.04.2020 | ||
LU | 26.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
LU | 26.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
LU | 26.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
LU | 26.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]HUP0203982 (MAECHLER UELI [CH], et al) [X] 1,4-8,11,16 * figures 1-16 * [Y] 3; | [A]TWM281163U (FAN JI-YUN [TW]) [A] 7-9* figures 3,4,5,8 *; | [A]US2011107644 (FAIFER SAGI [IL]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0027] - [0033] - [0038]; figures 1,2,5,6, *; | [YA]KR20110004858U (SYUTEOP CO. LTD) [Y] 3 * figures 1-3c * [A] 1; | [T] - MICHAEL WALDBRENNER, "Im Kampf gegen Terror", DWJ DAS MAGAZIN FÜR WAFFENBESITZER,, (201607), vol. 52, no. 7, pages 55 - 61, XP001596882 [T] * the whole document * | [A] - MALALLA H, "Kurze im langen Kleid", DWJ DEUTSCHES WAFFEN JOURNAL, DWJ VERLAGS, BLAUFELDEN, DE, (201008), vol. 46, no. 8, ISSN 0341-8936, pages 30 - 35, XP001564910 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |